U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00268
  • Case Name: Luzadder v. Accelerated Servicing Group, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 05, 2020: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [Closing Documents]
  • October 16, 2020: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • October 16, 2020: [Notice of Settlement]
  • October 08, 2020: [Judgment Debtor Exam]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Judgment Debtor Exam]
  • September 15, 2020: [Judgment]
  • September 15, 2020: [Default Judgment]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Default Judgment]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • June 17, 2020: [Default Entry by Clerk]
  • June 12, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2020
  • April 13, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 10, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 19, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • November 14, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 13, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 13, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • November 12, 2019: [Order]
  • November 12, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 11, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2019
  • September 04, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.