U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00272
  • Case Name: Harper v. United States Congress
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [USCA Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order]
  • March 04, 2020: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
December, 2019
  • December 04, 2019: [USCA Order]
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • October 07, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 02, 2019: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • October 01, 2019: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 27, 2019: [Brief /Other]
  • September 23, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • September 12, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 11, 2019: [Initial Review Order]
  • September 03, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 03, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.