U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00271
  • Case Name: Armstrong et al v. Iowa Department of Corrections et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 19, 2019: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 15, 2019: [Letter]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Initial Review Order]
  • September 30, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 03, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 03, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.