U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-00443
  • Case Name: Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company v. Phoenix C & D Recycling, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 10, 2020: [Costs Taxed]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • February 20, 2020: [Objections to Bill of Costs]
  • February 20, 2020: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • February 20, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 18, 2020: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • February 18, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
  • February 06, 2020: [Bill of Costs]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 22, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 22, 2020: [Strike]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Reply]
  • December 17, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 16, 2019: [Public Docket Annotation]
  • December 10, 2019: [Reply]
  • December 05, 2019: [Reply]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order]
  • December 03, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
  • December 03, 2019: [Strike]
  • December 03, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 21, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 15, 2019: [Reply]
  • November 12, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 08, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 04, 2019: [Brief /Other]
  • November 01, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 01, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Compel]
  • October 25, 2019: [Sanctions]
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [Notice - Other]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.