U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00164
  • Case Name: Rupe v. Ozark Automotive Distributors, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • January 24, 2020: [Transfer Case]
  • January 08, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • January 07, 2020: [Status Report]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 08, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Order]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 19, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 13, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 05, 2019: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • September 04, 2019: [Certificate]
  • September 04, 2019: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.