U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00280
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Approximately $13,036.00 in U.S. Currency
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • April 29, 2020: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • April 20, 2020: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • February 12, 2020: [Default Entry by Clerk]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Notice - Other]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 23, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • September 09, 2019: [Writ Issued]
  • September 06, 2019: [Issuance of Warrant in rem]
  • September 05, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.