U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00065
  • Case Name: Tennant et al v. Scott County IA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 13, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • April 06, 2020: [USCA Order]
March, 2020
  • March 06, 2020: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • December 05, 2019: [USCA Order]
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • November 07, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 05, 2019: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • October 28, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • September 30, 2019: [Letter]
  • September 27, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 27, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 11, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 06, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 06, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 06, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.