U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00282
  • Case Name: Pierce v. Iowa Department of Corrections
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
  • November 16, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • November 16, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 15, 2022: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2021
  • July 01, 2021: [Brief /Other]
June, 2021
  • June 01, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Brief /Other]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 20, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 23, 2020: [Submission of State Court Documents (Attorney General only)]
October, 2020
  • October 06, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 05, 2020: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 15, 2020: [Notice - Other]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 28, 2020: [CJA Attorney Appointment]
  • August 26, 2020: [Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • August 25, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 25, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • August 25, 2020: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • August 25, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 19, 2020: [Letter]
June, 2020
  • June 01, 2020: [Reply]
May, 2020
  • May 15, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 08, 2020: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • May 08, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 01, 2020: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 18, 2020: [Leave]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 18, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 18, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 17, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 12, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • February 03, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 13, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • January 11, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • January 11, 2020: [Submission of State Court Documents (Attorney General only)]
  • January 11, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • January 09, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 03, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • January 02, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • January 02, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2019
  • November 08, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Order]
  • September 06, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 06, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.