U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00283
  • Case Name: Moens v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Judgment]
  • July 17, 2020: [Order]
  • July 16, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • July 08, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order]
  • July 07, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 08, 2020: [Affidavit]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 15, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2020
  • April 25, 2020: [Order]
  • April 25, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 10, 2019: [Errata]
  • September 06, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 06, 2019: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.