U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00285
  • Case Name: Roland v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 10, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • January 14, 2020: [Stipulation]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • December 19, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 09, 2019: [Report of Rule 26.f Planning Meeting]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • November 19, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 13, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 13, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • November 06, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
October, 2019
  • October 10, 2019: [Order]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • September 19, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • September 17, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 17, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • September 16, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • September 16, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 06, 2019: [Notice to Attorneys/Pro Se Party (inter-district transfer in)]
  • September 06, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 06, 2019: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • September 06, 2019: [LR 10 Clerk's Staff Note]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.