U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00284
  • Case Name: Cole v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • January 28, 2022: [Stipulation]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 01, 2021: [Stay]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Stay]
  • October 25, 2021: [Sealed Document]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Continue]
  • September 01, 2021: [Continue]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • August 25, 2021: [Status Report]
  • August 24, 2021: [Status Report]
  • August 13, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 11, 2021: [Status Report]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Order]
  • February 24, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • October 02, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
August, 2020
  • August 10, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [Errata]
  • April 22, 2020: [Certificate]
  • April 22, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • April 22, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Sealed Document]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 16, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • December 16, 2019: [Report of Rule 26.f Planning Meeting]
  • December 11, 2019: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • December 09, 2019: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • November 11, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • November 08, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2019
  • October 10, 2019: [Order]
  • October 10, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • September 19, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • September 17, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 17, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • September 16, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • September 16, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 06, 2019: [Notice to Attorneys/Pro Se Party (inter-district transfer in)]
  • September 06, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 06, 2019: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • September 06, 2019: [LR 10 Clerk's Staff Note]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.