U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cv-04052
  • Case Name: Blackmore et al v. Smitty's Supply, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 28, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • April 28, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • April 20, 2020: [Exclude]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Leave to File Document]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • February 13, 2020: [Stay]
  • February 10, 2020: [Protective Order]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • January 14, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 03, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
December, 2019
  • December 04, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 04, 2019: [UNRESISTED Motion]
September, 2019
  • September 09, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.