U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00290
  • Case Name: Blessins v. United States Postal Service
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
  • September 03, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2021
  • August 07, 2021: [Closing Documents]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Settlement Conference]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order]
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: [Order]
  • May 13, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 12, 2021: [Order]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 08, 2021: [Order]
  • April 08, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 03, 2021: [Sealed Document]
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: [Order]
  • January 08, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 11, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 08, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 02, 2020: [Notice - Other]
November, 2020
  • November 02, 2020: [Notice - Other]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 16, 2020: [Status Report]
  • October 09, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • October 08, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 06, 2020: [Statement]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 01, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2020
  • August 12, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • August 06, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 06, 2020: [Reply]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2020
  • April 07, 2020: [Status Report]
March, 2020
  • March 17, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 17, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • March 11, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 10, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order]
  • March 10, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • March 10, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • March 05, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order]
  • March 03, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • March 02, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Order]
  • February 14, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 10, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2020
  • January 06, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 06, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
December, 2019
  • December 09, 2019: [Summons Issued]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Filing Fee Received]
  • September 11, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • September 11, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.