open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

IOWA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa
    Case Number:19-02158-lmj7
    Party Name:Brooke Erin Ruemmele and Nicholas David Ruemmele
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Discharging Debtor]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles L [Final Decree-Chapter 7]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles L [Close Case - Bankruptcy]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles L [Order of Discharge Chapter 7]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles L [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (Module)]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles L [Debtor's (for Joint Debtor only) Financial Management Course Certificate and/or Official Form 423]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles L [Debtor's Financial Management Course Certificate and/or Official Form 423]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles L [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles L [Order RE: Duties of Debtors - Chp 7]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles L [341 Meeting - Ch7 -No Asset-Ind]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles L [Corrective Entry]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles L [Employee Income Record]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Record]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles L [none]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles L [Debtor (for Joint Debtor only) Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Debtor (for Joint Debtor only) Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles L [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles L [Chapter 7 Statement of Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption from Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles L [Debtor Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Statement of Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption from Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Debtor Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.iasb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?148612
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =