U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00167
  • Case Name: Willson v. White
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 08, 2020: [Judgment]
  • July 07, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • March 25, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 24, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Order]
  • January 23, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • January 17, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2019
  • December 09, 2019: [Mail Returned]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Initial Review Order]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 12, 2019: [Brief /Other]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.