U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00294
  • Case Name: Mroz v. Meredith Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • November 19, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 18, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • November 13, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • November 05, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 05, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • September 12, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.