U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00293
  • Case Name: Etchen v. Corteva, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 04, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • February 03, 2021: [Stipulation]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 22, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • January 13, 2021: [In Limine]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order]
  • January 05, 2021: [Settlement Conference]
  • January 05, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 04, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
December, 2020
  • December 04, 2020: [Order]
  • December 04, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
October, 2020
  • October 06, 2020: [Sanctions]
  • October 06, 2020: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • October 06, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • October 06, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 05, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • September 25, 2020: [Leave]
  • September 21, 2020: [Errata]
  • September 19, 2020: [Sanctions]
  • September 18, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • September 17, 2020: [Reply]
  • September 17, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • September 11, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • September 11, 2020: [Compel]
  • September 10, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • September 10, 2020: [Leave]
  • September 10, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 08, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Order]
  • August 28, 2020: [Compel]
  • August 27, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • August 21, 2020: [Status Report]
  • August 14, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Errata]
  • June 25, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • June 25, 2020: [Status Report]
  • June 17, 2020: [Reply]
  • June 15, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 11, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • February 03, 2020: [Status Report]
  • February 03, 2020: [Order]
  • February 03, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: [Order]
  • November 07, 2019: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • November 07, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • November 06, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • November 04, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • November 04, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
October, 2019
  • October 03, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • October 02, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 01, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 16, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • September 16, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 13, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 13, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • September 12, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
  • September 12, 2019: [Certificate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.