U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00297
  • Case Name: Crippen v. Schumacher et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 15, 2022: [Letter]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Letter]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Letter]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Letter]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Letter]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Letter]
  • March 19, 2021: [Letter]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Letter]
July, 2020
  • July 16, 2020: [Letter]
  • July 06, 2020: [Letter]
  • July 02, 2020: [Letter]
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [Letter]
  • June 01, 2020: [Letter]
May, 2020
  • May 08, 2020: [Letter]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • January 06, 2020: [Reconsideration]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • December 10, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • December 06, 2019: [Letter]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 21, 2019: [Initial Review Order]
October, 2019
  • October 03, 2019: [Letter]
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 16, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 16, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.