U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00299
  • Case Name: Teesha Hubbard, et al v. New Prime, Inc., et al.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Order]
  • September 18, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 18, 2020: [Statement]
July, 2020
  • July 07, 2020: [Order]
  • July 07, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 07, 2020: [Statement]
May, 2020
  • May 12, 2020: [Witness List]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Order]
  • February 10, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 10, 2020: [Notice - Other]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 23, 2020: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • January 21, 2020: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Order]
  • December 19, 2019: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • December 19, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • December 18, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order]
  • December 16, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
October, 2019
  • October 14, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • October 14, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 19, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • September 18, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • September 17, 2019: [Errata]
  • September 17, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.