U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00067
  • Case Name: Regional Home Health Care, Inc. v. United States Department of Health and Human Services, et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • October 21, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Judgment]
  • September 21, 2020: [Dismiss]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • August 19, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • August 13, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • August 06, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 05, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • January 07, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 06, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 18, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 06, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 05, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Dismiss]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 22, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • October 22, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 08, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • September 19, 2019: [Notice to Attorneys/Pro Se Party (inter-district transfer in)]
  • September 18, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 18, 2019: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.