U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-03037
  • Case Name: Simmer v. Praetorian Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Protective Order]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Seal Document]
  • September 15, 2020: [Seal Document]
  • September 03, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • August 17, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Seal]
  • July 29, 2020: [Seal Document]
  • July 27, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • July 27, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • January 27, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [UNRESISTED Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.