U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00024
  • Case Name: Myre v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Judgment]
  • April 27, 2020: [Order]
  • April 21, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
  • April 03, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 03, 2020: [Order]
  • April 03, 2020: [Defendants Responsive Brief - Social Security Cases]
February, 2020
  • February 07, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • February 05, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order]
  • December 13, 2019: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • December 13, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2019
  • October 02, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • October 01, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 19, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.