U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00025
  • Case Name: Holloway v. Edwards et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice - Other]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Notice - Other]
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Letter]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Letter]
  • December 20, 2019: [Letter]
  • December 09, 2019: [Letter]
  • December 03, 2019: [Judgment]
  • December 02, 2019: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Brief /Other]
  • October 28, 2019: [Brief /Other]
  • October 16, 2019: [Order]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.