U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00307
  • Case Name: American Trading International, Inc. v. MCF Operating, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • November 26, 2019: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • November 21, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • November 20, 2019: [Reply]
  • November 13, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • October 16, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • October 16, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 10, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • October 07, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • October 07, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 03, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • October 03, 2019: [Brief /Other]
  • October 03, 2019: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 03, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 02, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • October 01, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Notice to Attorneys/Pro Se Party (inter-district transfer in)]
  • September 25, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 25, 2019: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • September 25, 2019: [Dismiss Case]
  • September 25, 2019: [Change Venue]
  • September 25, 2019: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.