U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cv-04054
  • Case Name: Hill v. CR Bard, Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 01, 2021: [Extension of Time re Transcript]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Extension of Time re Transcript]
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: [Stay]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Stay]
August, 2020
  • August 13, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • August 10, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2020
  • February 04, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 03, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Stay]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.