U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00308
  • Case Name: Vesey v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Judgment]
  • February 27, 2020: [Order]
  • February 26, 2020: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • February 26, 2020: [LR 83E Exhibits]
  • February 07, 2020: [Letter]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [Continue]
  • January 09, 2020: [Continue]
October, 2019
  • October 04, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 03, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 02, 2019: [CJA Attorney Appointment]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order]
  • September 30, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 30, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 26, 2019: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.