U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00309
  • Case Name: Aurora LED Technology, Inc. et al v. Putco, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • December 13, 2019: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 20, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 19, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 06, 2019: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • October 21, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • October 16, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • October 09, 2019: [Order]
  • October 09, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 09, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 08, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • October 08, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 02, 2019: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • October 01, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Notice to Attorneys/Pro Se Party (inter-district transfer in)]
  • September 27, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 27, 2019: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • September 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 26, 2019: [Order]
  • September 26, 2019: [Case Transferred Out - Divisional Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.