U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00313
  • Case Name: Burns v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [Judgment]
  • December 07, 2020: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 10, 2020: [Reply]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 27, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 28, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 22, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • July 01, 2020: [Affidavit]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • June 29, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
April, 2020
  • April 14, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 10, 2020: [CJA Attorney Appointment]
  • April 08, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 07, 2020: [Initial Review Order]
  • April 07, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
  • October 01, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
  • October 01, 2019: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.