U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00026
  • Case Name: Smith et al v. BASF Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • December 16, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • December 15, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
November, 2020
  • November 11, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
September, 2020
  • September 03, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Order]
  • August 31, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 31, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 31, 2020: [Vacate]
  • August 19, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 17, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • August 13, 2020: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • June 10, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 04, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 11, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 08, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 07, 2020: [Certificate]
  • May 07, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • March 31, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 24, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • March 19, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • March 11, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 11, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • March 10, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • March 10, 2020: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
  • March 04, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 18, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 17, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • February 14, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • February 13, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • February 13, 2020: [Order]
  • February 13, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • February 13, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • February 10, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • February 05, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 05, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • January 27, 2020: [Notice of Dismissal R16/Service - Clerk]
  • January 27, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • January 15, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • January 15, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • January 07, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • January 06, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • January 02, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 23, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 19, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • December 19, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 17, 2019: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • December 11, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • December 11, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 09, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 05, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • November 26, 2019: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 26, 2019: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • November 26, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 26, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 21, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • November 21, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 21, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 20, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • November 20, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • November 19, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 19, 2019: [Errata]
  • November 19, 2019: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • November 19, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • November 18, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 15, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • November 15, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 15, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 15, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 14, 2019: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 14, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 14, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • November 14, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 14, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • November 14, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 12, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • November 12, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • October 03, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • October 02, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 02, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.