U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00316
  • Case Name: Edgar Property Investment LLC v. United States Department of Agriculture
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 10, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • January 08, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • January 08, 2020: [Closing Documents]
  • January 08, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
December, 2019
  • December 02, 2019: [Status Conference]
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Order]
  • November 12, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 12, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2019
  • October 04, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • October 03, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • October 03, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.