U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00071
  • Case Name: Green v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Judgment]
  • September 21, 2020: [Dismiss]
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
March, 2020
  • March 04, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Errata]
  • February 20, 2020: [Dismiss]
October, 2019
  • October 04, 2019: [Filing Fee Received]
  • October 04, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • October 04, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.