U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00318
  • Case Name: Bush v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice - Other]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
June, 2020
  • June 02, 2020: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • February 27, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 26, 2020: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • February 24, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 21, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • January 15, 2020: [Dismiss]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Brief /Other]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 30, 2019: [Order]
  • October 25, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 04, 2019: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.