U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00321
  • Case Name: Tidriri v. The Board of Regents et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Supreme Court Filing]
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [Notice of Supreme Court Filing]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Notice of Supreme Court Filing]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
  • September 20, 2021: [USCA Order]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • October 23, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Judgment]
  • September 24, 2020: [Default Judgment]
  • September 24, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • September 24, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 24, 2020: [Entry of Default]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • August 25, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 25, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • August 21, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • August 12, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 12, 2020: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • August 11, 2020: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • August 05, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 22, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 17, 2020: [Default Entry by Clerk]
  • July 16, 2020: [Reply]
  • July 16, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 13, 2020: [Reply]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order]
  • July 07, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 02, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Reply]
  • June 26, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 19, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 18, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 18, 2020: [Default Judgment]
  • June 05, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • June 01, 2020: [Brief /Other]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 26, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Order]
  • April 21, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 21, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2020
  • March 09, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • March 03, 2020: [Brief /Other]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 18, 2020: [Reply]
  • February 10, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 27, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • January 22, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 15, 2020: [Notice of Dismissal R16/Service - Clerk]
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • October 07, 2019: [Complaint]
  • October 07, 2019: [Filing Fee Received]
  • October 07, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.