U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00325
  • Case Name: Rasmusson v. Monsanto Company, Inc.,
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [Judgment]
  • August 03, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
June, 2021
  • June 04, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Stay]
  • May 20, 2021: [Stay]
  • May 14, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Status Report]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 06, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • October 23, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • October 23, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • October 22, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 20, 2020: [Status Report]
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 18, 2020: [Status Report]
May, 2020
  • May 06, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 06, 2020: [Order]
  • May 06, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • May 06, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • May 05, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 04, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • May 04, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Order]
  • April 29, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
March, 2020
  • March 12, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • March 06, 2020: [Notice of Dismissal R16/Service - Clerk]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • December 11, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Errata]
  • November 19, 2019: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 19, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 06, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2019
  • October 10, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • October 09, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • October 08, 2019: [Letter]
  • October 08, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.