U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:11-cv-00032
  • Case Name: Near et al v. DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Reply]
  • January 19, 2023: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 17, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 13, 2023: [Amended Document - NOT Motion]
  • January 13, 2023: [Sealed Document]
  • January 13, 2023: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 13, 2023: [In Limine]
  • January 13, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice to Attorneys/Pro Se Party (inter-district transfer in)]
  • January 13, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 13, 2023: [Brief /Other]
  • January 13, 2023: [Add and Terminate Judges]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 09, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.