U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00027
  • Case Name: Stokke v. Montgomery County Memorial Hospital et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Letter]
  • January 29, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • January 28, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 27, 2020: [Order]
  • January 27, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • January 27, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • January 14, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 14, 2020: [Leave]
  • January 03, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • January 03, 2020: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • December 20, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • December 05, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • December 04, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • December 03, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 03, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 03, 2019: [Protective Order]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • November 25, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • November 20, 2019: [Order]
  • November 20, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 17, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 17, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • October 10, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.