U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00330
  • Case Name: Neogen Corporation v. Innovative Reproduction Technology, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • July 12, 2022: [Strike]
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • July 06, 2022: [Strike]
  • July 05, 2022: [Stay]
  • July 05, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 05, 2022: [Vacate]
  • July 05, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 05, 2022: [Costs Taxed]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • June 29, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • June 29, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • June 29, 2022: [Bill of Costs]
  • June 17, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 16, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order]
  • June 08, 2022: [Statement]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 09, 2022: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • May 09, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Transcript]
  • April 07, 2022: [Continue]
  • April 06, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Strike]
  • March 25, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 24, 2022: [Reply]
  • March 18, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 06, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • March 06, 2022: [Reply]
  • March 04, 2022: [Strike]
  • March 04, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • March 04, 2022: [Reply]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order]
  • February 25, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • February 25, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 07, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • February 04, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • February 04, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • February 04, 2022: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • February 04, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 04, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • February 03, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Seal]
  • January 07, 2022: [Continue]
  • January 06, 2022: [Continue]
  • January 04, 2022: [Reply]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • December 28, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 14, 2021: [Seal]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Reconsideration]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Reply]
  • August 09, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • July 26, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • July 26, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • July 19, 2021: [Enforce Judgment/Settlement]
  • July 19, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Sealed Document]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • May 18, 2021: [Order]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Transcript]
  • April 29, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 22, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • April 22, 2021: [Reply]
  • April 15, 2021: [Strike]
  • April 15, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • April 15, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 09, 2021: [Compel]
  • April 07, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • April 05, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 01, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • April 01, 2021: [Enforce Judgment/Settlement]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Status Report]
  • March 26, 2021: [Errata]
  • March 26, 2021: [Compel]
  • March 17, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 17, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 17, 2021: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • March 17, 2021: [Order]
  • March 17, 2021: [~Util - Set Trial Management Order Deadlines]
  • March 17, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • March 08, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • February 19, 2021: [Letter]
  • February 18, 2021: [Statement]
  • February 16, 2021: [Statement]
  • February 16, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • February 12, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 12, 2021: [Order]
  • February 12, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 11, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 11, 2021: [Status Report]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 14, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 11, 2020: [Reply]
  • December 07, 2020: [Errata]
  • December 04, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • November 16, 2020: [Compel]
  • November 04, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • November 04, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • November 04, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • November 03, 2020: [Errata]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • October 30, 2020: [Status Report]
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: [Errata]
  • August 17, 2020: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • August 03, 2020: [Counterclaim]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • July 24, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • July 23, 2020: [Order]
  • July 23, 2020: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • July 23, 2020: [~Util - Set Trial Management Order Deadlines]
  • July 22, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • July 22, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • July 21, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 07, 2020: [Leave]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 16, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 04, 2020: [Reconsideration]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Reply]
  • May 20, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 13, 2020: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • May 06, 2020: [Reconsideration]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Dismiss]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 21, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 12, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 06, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • January 16, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 13, 2020: [Reply]
  • January 13, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • January 10, 2020: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • January 08, 2020: [Order]
  • January 08, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 07, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 12, 2019: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • December 11, 2019: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • December 02, 2019: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • December 02, 2019: [Dismiss]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • November 11, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • November 07, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 28, 2019: [Counterclaim]
  • October 23, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • October 23, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 22, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 22, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • October 21, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 18, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 18, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • October 17, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 11, 2019: [Notice to Attorneys/Pro Se Party (inter-district transfer in)]
  • October 10, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 10, 2019: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.