U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00028
  • Case Name: Heckeroth v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 25, 2020: [Order]
  • June 17, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
  • June 07, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 07, 2020: [Order]
  • June 04, 2020: [Defendants Responsive Brief - Social Security Cases]
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
March, 2020
  • March 09, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 06, 2020: [Order]
  • March 06, 2020: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • March 06, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2020
  • January 03, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • October 18, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 15, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 11, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • October 11, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 11, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.