U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00332
  • Case Name: United States of America et al v. Hart et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 09, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • July 08, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • June 08, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 02, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • June 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: [Order]
  • April 13, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 13, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • April 13, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • April 08, 2021: [Errata]
  • April 08, 2021: [Notice - Other]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Continue]
  • March 30, 2021: [Continue]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • January 21, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • January 21, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 15, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • January 15, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Notice - Other]
August, 2020
  • August 13, 2020: [Set/Reset Trial Management Order Deadlines]
  • August 13, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • August 13, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • August 12, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 21, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 20, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2020
  • June 12, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • June 12, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • June 12, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 10, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • June 05, 2020: [Order]
  • June 05, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 05, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • May 22, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 18, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2020
  • April 01, 2020: [Dismiss]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • March 18, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • March 10, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Reply]
  • February 19, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 12, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
January, 2020
  • January 07, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 02, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • December 30, 2019: [Dismiss]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 07, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 07, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • October 15, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • October 15, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.