U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00029
  • Case Name: Wood et al v. Coaster Pedicab Manufacturing, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • December 26, 2019: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • December 20, 2019: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • December 02, 2019: [Closing Documents]
  • December 02, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 02, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 02, 2019: [Notice of Settlement]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • November 20, 2019: [Order]
  • November 20, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 18, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 23, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • October 16, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • October 15, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.