U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00333
  • Case Name: Emrit v. Horus Music Video Distribution et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Dismiss Case]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Notice of Dismissal R16/Service - Clerk]
  • February 07, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • February 07, 2020: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Appeal Remark]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • December 19, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 17, 2019: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • December 13, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [Notice - Other]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 15, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 15, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.