U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00075
  • Case Name: Higareda v. Tyson Foods, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 20, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • January 14, 2021: [Joinder]
  • January 14, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • January 05, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • January 05, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
October, 2020
  • October 06, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2020
  • September 01, 2020: [Reply]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 12, 2020: [Seal]
  • August 04, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • August 04, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: [Status Conference]
December, 2019
  • December 04, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • December 04, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • December 03, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 03, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 02, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • December 02, 2019: [Protective Order]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • November 20, 2019: [Order]
  • November 20, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 15, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 14, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • November 13, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 04, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 17, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • October 16, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.