U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:19-cv-02066
  • Case Name: Ceran v. Sherman
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 13, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 10, 2020: [Compel]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 18, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [Extension of Time]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 17, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.