U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cv-04063
  • Case Name: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Schuster Co
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • February 12, 2021: [Strike]
  • February 12, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • February 05, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Exclude]
  • January 19, 2021: [Strike]
  • January 18, 2021: [Strike]
  • January 15, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • January 15, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
September, 2020
  • September 08, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Compel]
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • July 02, 2020: [Continue Trial]
June, 2020
  • June 04, 2020: [Protective Order]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 02, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.