U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00335
  • Case Name: Sneed v. Des Moines County Correctional Center
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Mail Returned]
  • December 13, 2019: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: [Mail Returned]
  • November 05, 2019: [Mail Returned]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Order]
  • October 21, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.