U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00336
  • Case Name: United States of America v. $3,941.00 in U.S. Currency, et al.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Errata]
  • January 22, 2020: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • January 21, 2020: [Default Entry by Clerk]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • December 20, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Notice - Other]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Writ Issued]
  • October 28, 2019: [Issuance of Warrant in rem]
  • October 23, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.