U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00338
  • Case Name: Stafford v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 02, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • June 01, 2021: [Stipulation]
February, 2021
  • February 01, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Notice of Settlement]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 24, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 24, 2020: [Closing Documents]
  • September 24, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 10, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Sealed Document]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 17, 2019: [Amended Document - NOT Motion]
  • December 16, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • December 16, 2019: [Report of Rule 26.f Planning Meeting]
  • December 09, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • November 06, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 06, 2019: [Order]
  • November 01, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • November 01, 2019: [Add Party]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • October 29, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 29, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • October 25, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 24, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 24, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • October 24, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 23, 2019: [Notice to Attorneys/Pro Se Party (inter-district transfer in)]
  • October 23, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 23, 2019: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • October 23, 2019: [LR 10 Clerk's Staff Note]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.