U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00079
  • Case Name: Barton v. Regional Utility Service Systems (RUSS) et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 15, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [Reply]
  • May 11, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 07, 2020: [Amended Document - NOT Motion]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Order]
  • April 28, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 16, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 07, 2020: [Judgment]
  • April 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Errata]
  • February 24, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • February 06, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Reply]
  • December 09, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 04, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • November 18, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 12, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • October 24, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.