U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00228
  • Case Name: Songer v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
  • July 29, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 15, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
May, 2020
  • May 15, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 01, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [Judgment]
  • April 16, 2020: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
March, 2020
  • March 09, 2020: [Plaintiffs Reply Brief - Social Security Cases]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Defendants Responsive Brief - Social Security Cases]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
  • January 08, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 13, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 13, 2019: [Order]
  • November 01, 2019: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • November 01, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2019
  • October 26, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • October 24, 2019: [Notice of Dismissal R16/Service - Clerk]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.