U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00342
  • Case Name: Mitchell et al v. American Strategic Insurance Corp.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • August 14, 2020: [Errata]
  • August 12, 2020: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 14, 2020: [Closing Documents]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Status Conference]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • December 16, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order]
  • December 16, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 16, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • December 16, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • December 13, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 13, 2019: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Order]
  • November 15, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 15, 2019: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • November 14, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • October 25, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.